Louisiana 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB299 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version

                            HLS 20RS-564	ENGROSSED
2020 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 299
BY REPRESENTATIVE GREGORY MILLER
PUBLIC WORKS:  Increases the "contract limit" for certain public work related drainage
projects completed by regular maintenance employees of any governing authority
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 38:2212(C)(4), relative to public works drainage projects let by
3 any governing authority; to raise the threshold dollar amount that requires a public
4 bid for public work related to drainage projects completed by regular maintenance
5 employees of any governing authority; and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 38:2212(C)(4) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 
8 §2212.  Advertisement and letting to lowest responsible and responsive bidder;
9	public work; electronic bidding; participation in mentor-protégé program;
10	exemptions
11	*          *          *
12	C.
13	*          *          *
14	(4)  For public work related to drainage projects to be done by the regular
15 maintenance employees of the St. Charles Parish any governing authority, the term
16 "contract limit" shall be equal to the sum of two hundred fifty thousand dollars per
17 project, including labor, materials, and equipment as per the rates in the latest edition
18 of the Associated Equipment Dealers Rental Rate Book and administrative overhead
19 not to exceed fifteen percent, provided that beginning February 1, 2021, and annually
20 on February first of each subsequent year, the office of facility planning and control
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 20RS-564	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 299
1 within the division of administration shall adjust the "contract limit" by an amount
2 not to exceed the annual percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index in the
3 preceding year.  The office of facility planning and control within the division of
4 administration shall publish the new contract limit for public works contracts let by
5 the St. Charles Parish any governing authority in the Louisiana Register in January
6 of each year beginning in January 2021.  The provisions of this Paragraph shall
7 terminate on December 31, 2020 2025.
8	*          *          *
9 Section 2.  The provisions of Section 1 of this Act shall supersede the provision of
10Section 1 of Act 201 of the 2019 Regular Session of the Legislature which enacts R.S.
1138:2212(C)(4).
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 299 Engrossed 2020 Regular Session Gregory Miller
Abstract: Increases the "contract limit" that requires public bid for public work related to
drainage projects completed by regular maintenance employees of any governing
authority.
Present law provides an exception to the "contract limit" definition for public work related
to drainage projects to be done by regular maintenance employees of St. Charles Parish
governing authority.
Proposed law expands the exception to the "contract limit" definition for public work related
to drainage projects to include public work done by regular maintenance employees of any
governing authority.
Present law provides that the term "contract limit" is equal to the sum of $150,000 per
project, including labor, materials, and equipment as per the rates in the latest edition of the
Assoc. Equipment Dealers Rental Rate Book and administrative overhead not to exceed
15%, provided that beginning Feb. 1, 2015, and annually on Feb. 1st of each subsequent
year, the office of facility planning and control within the division of administration adjust
the "contract limit" by an amount not to exceed the annual percentage increase in the
Consumer Price Index in the preceding year.
Proposed law modifies the term "contract limit" to equal the sum of $250,000 per public
work related drainage project, including labor, materials, and equipment as per the rates in
the latest edition of the Assoc. Equipment Dealers Rental Rate Book and administrative
overhead not to exceed 15%, provided that beginning Feb. 1, 2021, and annually on Feb. 1st
of each subsequent year, the office of facility planning and control within the division of
administration adjust the "contract limit" by an amount not to exceed the annual percentage
increase in the Consumer Price Index in the preceding year.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 20RS-564	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 299
Present law requires the office of facility planning and control within the division of
administration to publish the new contract limit for public works contracts in the La.
Register in Jan. of each year, beginning Jan. 2021.
Proposed law retains present law.
Present law sunsets the "contract limit" exception for the St. Charles Parish governing
authority on Dec. 31, 2020.
Proposed law extends the sunset for the "contract limit" exception to any governing authority
to Dec. 31, 2025.
Proposed law supersedes the enactment of present law, R.S. 38:2212(C)(4), made by Section
1 of Act No. 201 of the 2019 Regular Session.
(Amends R.S. 38:2212(C)(4))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.