House
|
06/15/2020
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2020
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read. (See 2020 1ES journal for Veto Message)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|