House | 05/22/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Reported favorably (9-7). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/27/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/27/2020 | Prefiled. |