Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|