House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 56. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|