Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 24 yeas and 14 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
By a vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 23. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (21-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|