House
|
06/12/2020
|
Effective date: 06/30/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2020
|
Becomes Act No. 366.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Reported without amendments (10-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (21-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|