Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (14-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|