Senate | 05/28/2020 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/22/2020 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Reported favorably (23-0). | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Prefiled. |