House
|
06/15/2020
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2020
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read. (See 2020 1ES journal for Veto Message)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 23, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported with amendments (8-6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|