Senate | 05/12/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/16/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20. | ||
House | 03/11/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/11/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 03/11/2020 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Prefiled. |