Senate | 05/25/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Prefiled. |