House | 05/18/2020 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Reported with amendments (13-1-1). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 02/28/2020 | Prefiled. |