Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Talbot, and Cathey.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Frieman, Brown, and Seabaugh.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|