Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|