House
|
06/13/2020
|
Effective date: 06/13/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (14-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|