House
|
06/12/2020
|
Effective date: 01/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 294.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably (9-5-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|