House
|
06/13/2020
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 342.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|