House
|
06/05/2020
|
Effective date: 08/01/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 92.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (20-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|