House
|
06/11/2020
|
Effective date: 06/11/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 285.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 35. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|