Senate | 05/25/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
House | 05/22/2020 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Reported with amendments (8-3). | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/04/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/31/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |