Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|