House
|
06/09/2020
|
Effective date: 08/01/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 110.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
By a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
By a vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|