House
|
06/04/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|