House
|
06/04/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|