House
|
06/02/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 69, nays 28. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|