House | 06/04/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2020 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/31/2020 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2020 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
House | 05/22/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |