House
|
06/04/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 66, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
By a vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 72, nays 24. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|