House
|
06/04/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|