House
|
06/01/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|