LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR83
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR83
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR83
Action History
Senate
05/25/2020
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
House
05/22/2020
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
House
05/21/2020
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
House
05/21/2020
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/20/2020
Reported favorably (13-0).
House
05/13/2020
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.