House | 06/04/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2020 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/31/2020 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2020 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |