House
|
06/04/2020
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 79, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 59, nays 31. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|