Senate | 05/26/2020 | Approved on 5/27/2020. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2020 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/26/2020. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | Request study by the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/20/2020. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Sent to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/13/2020. | ||
House | 05/04/2020 | Received on 5/4/2020. |