House | 05/31/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. | ||
House | 05/31/2020 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/31/2020 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/29/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/20. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Reported favorably (8-7-1). | ||
House | 05/04/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/31/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |