House | 06/04/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/29/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |