House | 06/04/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/29/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. | ||
House | 05/28/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2020 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |