Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 212.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Edmonds, Huval, and Bacala.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Milligan, Tarver, and Womack.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|