Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Effective date 8/1/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 232.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|