House | 05/20/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2020 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2020 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2020 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2020 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2020 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |