Senate
|
06/12/2020
|
Effective date 6/12/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 311.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 62, nays 39. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Zeringue, Schexnayder, and Gary Carter.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Cortez, and Tarver.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 11 for 05/28/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 11 for 05/26/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Reported with amendments (13-9). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|