Senate
|
06/12/2020
|
Effective date 6/12/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 313.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported favorably (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|