Louisiana 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB279 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            SLS 20RS-523	ORIGINAL
2020 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 279
BY SENATOR PETERSON 
EMPLOYMENT.  Constitutional amendment to establish and provide for the gradual
increase in the state minimum hourly wage. (2/3 - CA13s1(A))
1	A JOINT RESOLUTION
2 Proposing to add Article XII, Section 17 of the Constitution of Louisiana, relative to the
3 establishment of a state minimum hourly wage; to provide relative to employers with
4 fifty full-time employees or more; to provide for a minimum hourly wage; to provide
5 relative to employees eighteen years of age and older; and to specify an election for
6 submission of the proposition to electors and provide a ballot proposition.
7 Section 1. Be it resolved by the Legislature of Louisiana, two-thirds of the members
8 elected to each house concurring, that there shall be submitted to the electors of the state, for
9 their approval or rejection in the manner provided by law, a proposal to add Article XII,
10 Section 17 of the Constitution of Louisiana, to read as follows:
11 ยง17. State Minimum Hourly Wage
12	Section 17. Every employer with fifty or more full-time employees shall
13 pay each employee eighteen years or older wages which are at least equal to the
14 state's minimum hourly wage as follows:
15	(1)  Beginning August 1, 2021, the state minimum hourly wage shall be
16 eleven dollars per hour or the federal minimum wage, whichever is higher.
17	(2)  Beginning August 1, 2023, the state minimum hourly wage shall be
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 279
SLS 20RS-523	ORIGINAL
1 thirteen dollars per hour, or the federal minimum wage, whichever is higher.
2	(3)  Beginning August 1, 2025, the state minimum hourly wage shall be
3 fifteen dollars per hour, or the federal minimum wage, whichever is higher.
4 Section 2.  Be it further resolved that this proposed amendment shall be submitted
5 to the electors of the state of Louisiana at the statewide election to be held on
6 November 3, 2020.
7 Section 3.  Be it further resolved that on the official ballot to be used at said election
8 there shall be printed a proposition, upon which the electors of the state shall be permitted
9 to vote YES or NO, to amend the Constitution of Louisiana, which proposition shall read as
10 follows:
11	Do you support an amendment to establish a state minimum hourly wage
12	which would require every employer with fifty or more employees to pay
13	each employee eighteen years or older at least the higher of the federal
14	minimum hourly wage or eleven dollars beginning August 1, 2021, thirteen
15	dollars beginning August 1, 2023, and fifteen dollars beginning August 1,
16	2025?
17	(Adds Art. XII, Sec. 17) 
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot.
DIGEST
SB 279 Original 2020 Regular Session	Peterson
Proposed constitutional amendment establishes a state minimum hourly wage and provides
for gradual increases. 
Proposed constitutional amendment requires that, effective Aug. 1, 2021, every employer
with 50 or more full-time employees pay to each employee 18 years of age and older at least
the state minimum hourly wage of $11 per hour or the federal minimum wage, whichever
is higher.
Proposed constitutional amendment provides that beginning Aug. 1, 2023, the state
minimum hourly wage shall be $13 per hour or the federal minimum wage, whichever is
higher.
Proposed constitutional amendment provides that beginning Aug. 1, 2025, the state
minimum hourly wage shall be $15 per hour or the federal minimum wage, whichever is
higher.
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 279
SLS 20RS-523	ORIGINAL
Specifies submission of the amendment to the voters at the statewide election to be held on
November 3, 2020.
(Adds Const. Art. XII, Sec. 17)
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.