Senate | 05/22/2020 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 21 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2020 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2020 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |