Senate
|
06/12/2020
|
Effective date 6/12/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 316.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Jones, James, and Miguez.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Johns, and Smith.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|