House
|
06/15/2020
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2020
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read. (See 2020 1ES journal for Veto Message)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Mike Johnson, Davis, and Jordan.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
By a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|