Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Effective date 8/1/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 228.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|