Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Effective date 6/9/2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 122.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported favorably (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2020
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|