House | 05/28/2020 | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/27/2020 | Reported with amendments (9-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 15 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2020 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2020 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2020 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |