LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB443
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB443
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB443
Action History
Senate
05/15/2020
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
05/14/2020
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
Senate
05/14/2020
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 21 nays.
Senate
05/07/2020
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
05/04/2020
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Senate
03/31/2020
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.